U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40220-
  • Case Name: Paige Lin Di Bella
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Extend Time]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Court's Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order regarding Ch.7 Filing Fee Waiver Application]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.