U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00248-
  • Case Name: Regina Bea Marsters
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Confirmation Memo]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor Directing Payment to Trustee]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Confirmation Memo]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Pay Trustee]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.