U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40224-
  • Case Name: TR Welding, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice of Additional Missing Documents]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.