U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40248-
  • Case Name: Todd Lincoln Weichers, II and Kassidy Paige Weichers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Seal]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Seal/Redact (SEALED)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.