U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00257-
  • Case Name: Jack D Parker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Relief from Stay]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice of Additional Missing Documents]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Seal]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Seal/Redact (SEALED)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.