U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20126-
  • Case Name: Julia Rose Marlatt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order To Debtor's Employer To Pay The Trustee]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Pay Wages]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor Directing Payment to Trustee]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.13 Plan]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Pay Trustee]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.