Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:1:15-cv-07469
    Party Name:Hall v. Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?314709
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =