open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:19-03575
    Party Name:Ashanti D Lockett, Sr
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall Marilyn O Judge: Goldgar A. Benjamin [Proof of Service]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall Marilyn O Judge: Goldgar A. Benjamin [Chapter 13 Plan/Amended Plan]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall Marilyn O Judge: Goldgar A. Benjamin [Schedules]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall Marilyn O Judge: Goldgar A. Benjamin [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall Marilyn O Judge: Goldgar A. Benjamin [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall Marilyn O Judge: Goldgar A. Benjamin [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall Marilyn O Judge: Goldgar A. Benjamin [Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall Marilyn O Judge: Goldgar A. Benjamin [Order to Employer to Pay the Trustee]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall Marilyn O Judge: Goldgar A. Benjamin [Notice of Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Proposed Order to Employer to Pay the Trustee]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan/Amended Plan]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1470050
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =