open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:4:19-cv-04179
    Party Name:Simpson v. State Collection Service Inc
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Scheduling Conference (Rule 16)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance of Attorney]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?77693
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =