open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:3:19-cv-03186
    Party Name:Willingham v. Jennings et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service/Counsel]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance of Attorney]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [HIPAA Order]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Merit Review Opinion]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Merit Review Hearing]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Request Counsel]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request Counsel]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Case Opening]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?77692
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =