open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:4:20-cv-04029
    Party Name:Henderson v. Stulir et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Change of Address Notification]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance of Attorney]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [HIPAA Order]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Merit Review Opinion]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Request Counsel]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request Counsel]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Case Opening]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ilcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?79041
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =