open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:4:20-cv-04028
    Party Name:Gay v. Ward et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance of Attorney]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [HIPAA Order]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Merit Review Opinion]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Request Counsel]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request Counsel]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Case Opening]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ilcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?79039
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =