open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:20-13132
    Party Name:Cedric Orr
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [Notice]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [Request Chapter 7 341 Meeting of Creditors No Asset]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [Notice of Deficiency Chapter 7 (Case Opening Only)]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [Request for Service of Notices]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer (Form 2800)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice,Declaration and Signature (Form 119)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1)/(122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [Statement About Social Security Numbers (Form 121)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kanner, Ebner Deborah [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1521434
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =