open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:1:20-cv-01288
    Party Name:Trent v. Burns et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance of Attorney]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Interest]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ilcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?80759
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =