open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:20-15333
    Party Name:Donica A Brooks
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Richard J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Richard J [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Richard J [Request Chapter 7 341 Meeting of Creditors No Asset]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Richard J [none]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Richard J [Request for Service of Notices]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Richard J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Richard J [Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1)/(122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Richard J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Richard J [Statement About Social Security Numbers (Form 121)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Richard J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1523966
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =