open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:20-90687
    Party Name:Justin Ray Allen and Lindsay Marie Allen
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wilson, Kristin [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorney Filer - Text Only)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wilson, Kristin [Financial Management Course Certificate (eFinCert)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wilson, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wilson, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wilson, Kristin [Certification of Credit Counseling (must be obtained BEFORE filing date of petition)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wilson, Kristin [Creditor Request for Notices (Creditor Filer - Text Only)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wilson, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wilson, Kristin [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wilson, Kristin [Statement of SSN]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wilson, Kristin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)Credit Card (SYSTEM USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ilcb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?154069
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =