U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00921
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Suppressed
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sealed Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sealed Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Sealed Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Sealed Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.