U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00926
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Suppressed
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 14, 2025: [Sealed Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sealed Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.