U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-03192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report + +]
  • December 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 15, 2022: [Arrest]
  • December 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 08, 2022: [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT UNREDACTED - Sealed+]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 08, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.