U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-mc-00937
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Suppressed
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • May 06, 2025: [Withdraw]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sealed Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: [Sealed Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.