U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-mc-03005
  • Case Name: First National Property Management L.L.C v. May
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Response (NOT to a motion/petition)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response (NOT to a motion/petition)]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Sanctions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.