U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-08082-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Bhatol et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Dismissing Counts]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.