U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00425-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Qreini
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [1 - Defendant Name]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [1 - Defendant Name]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Defendant Name]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.