U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Central District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • May 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arrest]
  • May 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2025: [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT UNREDACTED - Sealed+]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Services Recommendation +]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Service Report Addendum + +]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Pretrial Services Recommendation +]
  • April 22, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report + +]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.