U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-07695
  • Case Name: Grunt Style LLC v. TWD, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 25, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.