U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40179-mel
  • Case Name: Christian Richard Stroud and Shanda Michelle Stroud
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Relief from Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Auto-docket of Credit Card]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Notice of Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Relief from Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Auto-docket of Credit Card]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Order and Deficiency Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Notice of Error/Deficiencies]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (Auto)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frazier, Dana S [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.