U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-06055
  • Case Name: Lawrence J Lewis, Sr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Hearing Continued (Motion)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Employer to Pay the Trustee]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Proposed Order to Employer to Pay the Trustee]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Notice of Objection (Text Only)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Proof of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Chapter 13 Plan/Amended Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [none]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13a)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.