U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40182
  • Case Name: Mackie J Stephan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Amended Schedules (D, E, F, and E/F) (Fee)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Auto-docket of Credit Card]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule - Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule - Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule - Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules (106 Dec)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule I]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule J]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule G]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule H]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule D]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule E/F]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule C]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule A/B]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule - Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Financial Management Course]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Order and Deficiency Notice]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Commence Payments]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (Auto)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Motion]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Leave]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Auto-docket of Credit Card]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.