U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40181
  • Case Name: Ebany R Robison
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Auto-docket of Credit Card]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Amended Matrix (Fee)]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule - Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule - Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule - Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules (106 Dec)]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule J]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule H]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule I]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule G]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule D]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule E/F]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule C]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule A/B]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Schedule - Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Order and Deficiency Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Update Motion Deadlines]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Commence Payments]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (Auto)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Motion]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Leave]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Auto-docket of Credit Card]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.