U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Solis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 04, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance Held]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arraignment Held]
  • May 01, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.