U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-22569-jpk
  • Case Name: Richard A Pelzel and Debra K Pelzel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Freeland, Daniel L. [Redact]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Freeland, Daniel L. [Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Freeland, Daniel L. [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Freeland, Daniel L. [Closing Case (Auto)]
  • January 04, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Freeland, Daniel L. [Discharging Debtor (Auto)]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Freeland, Daniel L. [Delay Discharge]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Freeland, Daniel L. [Delay Discharge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.