Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00036-1
    Party Name:USA v. WILCOXSON
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Combined Petition to Enter Plea/Plea Agreement/Stipulation of Facts - (optional Sealed - entry)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SCHEDULING Order]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NGPL (Not guilty plea)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [PENALTY SHEET]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?91710
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =