Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:2:18-cr-00008-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Bullard
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Bond Report]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.innd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?92959
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =