open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00020-1
    Party Name:USA v. PIGGEE
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NGPL (Not guilty plea)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SCHEDULING Order]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedures and Practices]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [PENALTY SHEET]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?95620
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =