open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00470
    Party Name:WILLIAMS v. LAMMER
  • Filing Type:Civil [Copy Request]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Return to Order to Show Cause (Habeas Case Only)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time (Other)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return to Order to Show Cause (Habeas Case Only)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?98529
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =