open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-03437
    Party Name:GREEN v. SEVIER et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Pro se Litigant]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?98527
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =