open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:19-11299-reg
    Party Name:Matthew Richard McClure
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Miller, Debra L. [Pay Wages]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Miller, Debra L. [Notice Re: Financial Management Certificate]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Miller, Debra L. [File]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Miller, Debra L. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Miller, Debra L. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Miller, Debra L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Miller, Debra L. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.innb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?411716
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =