open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00390
    Party Name:Carmack v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Administrative Record]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.innd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?100160
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =