open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00192
    Party Name:MATTINGLY v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Closed Dismissed]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Procedures and Practices]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?99480
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =