open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-03851
    Party Name:LATIF v. FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOTIVE
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Case Management]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Plan Tendered by]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Parties First Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [SCHEDULING Order]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons (proposed)]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time (Other)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?99477
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =