open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-04746
    Party Name:JONES v. TAYLOR et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Appeal)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Closed Judgment]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Parties Short Record]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion (Other)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Pro se Litigant]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118353
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =