open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-04745
    Party Name:JONES v. FRANKLIN et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Documents for service by USM]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response (For Court Use Only)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion (Other)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Pro se Litigant]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118352
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =