open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00065
    Party Name:HARRIS v. SAUL
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript SSA]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time (Other)]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Appeal)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Closed Remanded to]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?89313
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =