open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:20-04491--13
    Party Name:Ronald W. Federick and Theresa L. Federick
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Amended/Corrected Petition]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Certification of Personal Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:September 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [341 Meeting Held - Trustee's Initial Report (TR7A)]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [BNC Certificate of Service - 341 Meeting Notice]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Certificate of Service re: Plan Notice (Ch 13 Only)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Plan Notice - Debtor or Trustee Distribution (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [341 Meeting Notice - Ch 13]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Pay Advices and/or Statement in Lieu of Pay Advices]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Chapter 13 Plan - Original/Corrected Original]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.insb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?724911
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =