U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00956-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOSIER et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • April 22, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 21, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Change of Attorney Information]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 23, 2020: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • November 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.