U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00980-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BAILEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 25, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • November 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2020: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • November 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2020: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.