U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-01012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PHIRI
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2020: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 04, 2020: [Vacate]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 01, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2020: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Empty Text]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • November 19, 2020: [PENALTY SHEET]
  • November 19, 2020: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.