U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00979-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JORDAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 24, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 24, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • December 28, 2020: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • November 19, 2020: [PENALTY SHEET]
  • November 19, 2020: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.