U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-01023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RAMEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 02, 2020: [Motion (Other)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Submission]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2020: [Submission]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Empty Text]
  • November 25, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • November 23, 2020: [PENALTY SHEET]
  • November 23, 2020: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.