U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00674-1
  • Case Name: USA v. QUALLS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 09, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.